CO HB1175 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Minority K-12 Teachers Study Strategy Report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minority K-12 Teachers Study Strategy Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1175 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1175, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1175, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. Committee discussion ensued (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-06HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-06HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2014-04-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175ed_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23E614A42B53257E87257C4A0075DF47/$FILE/1175_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C6B35117C04E230F87257C7D0077D541
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CB82B7DBCF73D4BC87257C7D00772398
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/40A97368827106DF87257C7D007746C6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CB82B7DBCF73D4BC87257C7D00772398
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C6B35117C04E230F87257C7D0077D541
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/40A97368827106DF87257C7D007746C6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E1BE5DFA91734FF287257CB6004F5E5E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D464D7FD25E8E22A87257CB6004F5779
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7AA6FD33DC14E88B87257CC30060CE0C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0C4D4FA2DCB7764087257CC5004F1D7D

Bill Comments

feedback