CO HB1174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning out-of-network health care services provided to covered persons, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-network Health Care Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.013, as amended (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment K) to amendment L.013 (Attachment F). (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.024 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1174
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1174_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1174_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1174_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8d7ea8fac3157643872583be004dcf03-hb19-1174-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8d7ea8fac3157643872583be004dcf03-hb19-1174-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-9-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-10-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5d1a4d0a455d990872583b500801b83-hb19-1174-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1174vote554116

Bill Comments

feedback