CO HB1172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning money allocated from an appropriation from the marijuana tax cash fund to a designated managed service organization to implement its community action plan.
Title
Money Allocated To Designated Managed Service Organization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/01/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |