CO HB1171 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring just cause for the eviction of a tenant from a residential premises.
Title
Just Cause Requirement Eviction Of Residential Tenant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1171 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (2nd) (Y: 19 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.051) (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.050) (Y: 16 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (2nd) (Y: 19 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.051) (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.050) (Y: 16 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2023-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |