CO HB1171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the kidney disease prevention and education task force, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Kidney Disease Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1171 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1171 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1171 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1171, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1171 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |