CO HB1167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the relocation of the definition of "alternative fuel" from a part of the statutes in which the definition is no longer referenced to a part of the statutes in which the definition is referenced.
Title
Move Alternative Fuel Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1167 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1167 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |