CO HB1164 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Unwanted Horse Tax Checkoff
Title
Extend Unwanted Horse Tax Checkoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1164 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |