CO HB1159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the state engineer to confirm the extent of uses of water in existence on the date of an instream flow appropriation.
Title
State Engineer Confirm Existing Use Instream Flow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1159 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1159 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |