CO HB1158 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning nonsubstantive modifications to sales and use tax exemptions, and, in connection therewith, reorganizing sales and use tax exemptions for agriculture, livestock, and special fuels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Fuel Farm Equipment Sales Use Taxx

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Governor Signed
2021-04-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-24HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1158
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1158_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1158_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69c6d79f3ee89606872586a0006c4c47-hb21-1158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1158vote54b717
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/919c6c9f811a19dc872586b7005843d4-hb21-1158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1158vote5a4761

Bill Comments 750

feedback