CO HB1158 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the department of corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental Appropriation - Dept Of Corrections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor Signed
2018-03-21 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-20HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2018-02-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-16HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/16/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/15/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1158
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1158_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-02-06t073711z-hb18-1158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1158vote6537fd
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-03-06t083826z-hb18-1158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1158vote53f3b5

Bill Comments

feedback