CO HB1156 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning limitations on penalties for truancy.
Title
Limit Penalties For Juvenile Truancy
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Chris Holbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-17 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 03/19/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |