CO HB1152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of statutes related to the obsolete capitol dome restoration fund.
Title
Repeal Obsolete Capitol Dome Restoration Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |