CO HB1149 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning supporting an energy sector career pathway for Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Sector Career Pathway In Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1149 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1149 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1149, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1149, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1149, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2021-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1149
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1149_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1149_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1149_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1149_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1149_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1149_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1149_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1149_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/88e9d6b574db4586872586aa00723835-hb21-1149-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/88e9d6b574db4586872586aa00723835-hb21-1149-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/61c330fa1c7a2b02872586c0004f4abd-hb21-1149-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/61c330fa1c7a2b02872586c0004f4abd-hb21-1149-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1149vote5562fc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2e4bf1902a885442872586cb00715347-hb21-1149-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4593e22846c64bb0872586e3004fb6b9-hb21-1149-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1149vote5e7e46

Bill Comments 750

feedback