CO HB1147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of a deepfake in a communication related to a candidate for elective office, and, in connection therewith, requiring disclosure, providing for enforcement, and creating a private cause of action for candidates.
Title
Candidate Election Deepfake Disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment C). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment C). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-02-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |