CO HB1142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Trustee Conduct Electronic Foreclosure Sale
Title
Public Trustee Conduct Electronic Foreclosure Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-02 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-02 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance |