CO HB1138 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning standardizing public official oaths of office, and, in connection therewith, providing a uniform oath text and establishing requirements for taking, subscribing, administering, and filing public oaths of office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Official Oaths And Affirmations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment H]. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Governor Signed
2018-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1138
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1138_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-02-14t133420z-hb18-1138-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1138vote5bb0ab
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-03-07t134613z-hb18-1138-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-03-07t134613z-hb18-1138-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-03-07t134613z-hb18-1138-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-03-07t134613z-hb18-1138-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1138vote543a94
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1138vote58c87b
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1138vote58df14
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-02-14t133420z-hb18-1138-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback