CO HB1138 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sex Offender Management Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Offender Management Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-27 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-12 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-09 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2011-05-03 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2011-04-29 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-04-28 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-04-12 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-04-07 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-03-23 Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2011-03-15 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Appropriations
2011-03-09 House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-08 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-03-07 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2011-03-04 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-02-22 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2011-01-21 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4C58AE419927B6C8725781700706DEE/$FILE/1138_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8308B8DF1B15F8E587257840001C0516
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C24C9B9B7FCBF8518725784900506566
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C26EBDC0B447CBD28725785C00796CAD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D786F48CCA98DC8F8725786B005F763C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8308B8DF1B15F8E587257840001C0516
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C24C9B9B7FCBF8518725784900506566
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C26EBDC0B447CBD28725785C00796CAD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D786F48CCA98DC8F8725786B005F763C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8308B8DF1B15F8E587257840001C0516
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C24C9B9B7FCBF8518725784900506566
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C26EBDC0B447CBD28725785C00796CAD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D786F48CCA98DC8F8725786B005F763C

Bill Comments

feedback