CO HB1137 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
People First Language In Laws
Title
People First Language In Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1137 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-26 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-19 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-05 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-02 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |