CO HB1133 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annual report on filing-office rules by the secretary of state.
Title
Repeal SOS Secretary of State Annual Report UCC Uniform Commericial Code Filing-office Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |