CO HB1130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - House Second Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that a person have a certification from the Colorado peace officer standards and training board in order to be eligible to serve as the elected sheriff of a county of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Sheriff Qualification Training Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 19 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1130 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Lost - No Amendments
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback