CO HB1126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a state income tax credit for an eligible educator's classroom expenses.
Title
Eligible Educator Classroom Expenses Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Janice Rich [R] | Sen. John Cooke [R] | Rep. Stephanie Luck [R] | Rep. Hugh McKean [R] |
Sen. Rod Pelton [R] | Sen. Kevin Van Winkle [R] | Sen. Rob Woodward [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1126 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1126 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 22-1126 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 22-1126 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1126 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 22-1126 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 22-1126 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Reconsider to Finance |
2022-02-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |