CO HB1121 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain health care professions regulated by the department of regulatory agencies, and, in connection therewith, requiring criminal history record checks for individuals with prescriptive authority and certified nurse aides, repealing the nurse licensure compact, enacting the enhanced nurse licensure compact, and, making an appropriation.
Title
Patient Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1121 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1121 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment P) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1121 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment P) to House Bill 17-1121. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |