CO HB1121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bar Felons From School Employment
Title
Bar Felons From School Employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1121 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments to 03/08/2011 | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-14 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |