CO HB1117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Gov Allow Charitable Giving From Motorists
Title
Local Gov Allow Charitable Giving From Motorists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1117 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1117, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2012-02-20 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-13 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |