CO HB1110 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adding language to relevant Colorado statutes related to persons with disabilities to strengthen protections against discrimination on the basis of disability, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Laws For Persons With Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1110 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2021-05-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1110
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1110_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1110_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1110_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1110_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1110_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1110_L.008.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1110_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1110_hs2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1110_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0cc2ae02275cd390872586a20071708a-hb21-1110-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/12cb8704b8686efd872586ce0053d162-hb21-1110-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/12cb8704b8686efd872586ce0053d162-hb21-1110-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1110vote636936
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dcb0e43c760055c872586db006bfa0b-hb21-1110-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f15028af34ee57ce872586e9004e0330-hb21-1110-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1110vote5a9e57
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dcb0e43c760055c872586db006bfa0b-hb21-1110-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1110vote5b874d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1110vote5b9bb5

Bill Comments 750

feedback