CO HB1109 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Application Of State Water Law To Federal Agencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application Of State Water Law To Federal Agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1109 to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005, as a substitute amendment to L.004 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1109 indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003, as amended (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1109 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1109 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseGovernor Signed
2016-04-11HouseSent to the Governor
2016-04-11HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-31SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-30SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
2016-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2016-03-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2016 - No Amendments
2016-03-07HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-01-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F3F6CD72A9FAB52787257F24006424C4/$FILE/1109_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/67AE92D68B94D10D87257F700001127F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/67AE92D68B94D10D87257F700001127F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F2B88E3AEAE1811187257F700000E6FE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A2FC7B15527DA87687257F6F0082FBA6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2E718E5E43CC3CCA87257F6F00819E95
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/090290925EF4CDC687257F85005343BF/$FILE/Ma29.pdf#608
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4C63FF84B93E041D87257F8600625FFA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/4202354021D0F27D87257F88004DCB16/$FILE/jour_080.pdf#599

Bill Comments

feedback