CO HB1109 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Additional SB09-228 Transfers To HUTF & Cap Constr

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional SB09-228 Transfers To HUTF & Cap Constr

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1109 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1109 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1109 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1109 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2015-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback