CO HB1109 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telecom Equip Local Sales Tax Exemption
Title
Telecom Equip Local Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-05 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-07 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |