CO HB1104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection of firefighters' personal information from publication on the internet.
Title
Prohibiting Firefighter Personal Information on Internet
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |