CO HB1104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning court proceedings related to relinquishment of parental rights.
Title
Court Procedures Relinquishment Parental Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |