CO HB1101 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Decisions For Unrepresented Patients
Title
Medical Decisions For Unrepresented Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.010, page 1, line 5, strike "REMOVAL" and substitute "HARVESTING" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to lay the bill over to March 15, 2016. The chair ruled that it was not a proper motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment G), as a substitute to amendment L.005 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.010, page 1, line 5, strike "REMOVAL" and substitute "HARVESTING" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to lay the bill over to March 15, 2016. The chair ruled that it was not a proper motion. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment G), as a substitute to amendment L.005 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2016-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |