CO HB1100 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability to file documents electronically with governmental entities.
Title
Electronic Filing Of Documents With Governmental Entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |