CO HB1094 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-7)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the transition of youth in Colorado's foster care system to successful adulthood, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Youth In Transition Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1094 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1094, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Governor Signed
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1094
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1094_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1094_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1094_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1094_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1094_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1094_L.007.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1094_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1094_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1094_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1094_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc6ba47aab1abc958725869a00710817-hb21-1094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc6ba47aab1abc958725869a00710817-hb21-1094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc6ba47aab1abc958725869a00710817-hb21-1094-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f25f66e28d31a00872586d2004d2c4e-hb21-1094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f25f66e28d31a00872586d2004d2c4e-hb21-1094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1094vote548fe6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1d4b1187b19c079872586df006d4be9-hb21-1094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0966000695a847e0872586e10053d164-hb21-1094-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1094vote554f65
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1094vote542503
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1094vote16c873
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1094vote16dda1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1d4b1187b19c079872586df006d4be9-hb21-1094-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1d4b1187b19c079872586df006d4be9-hb21-1094-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback