CO HB1093 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an increase in the exemption for the cash surrender value of life insurance.
Title
Increase Exemption For Life Insurance Cash Value
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Ransom [R] | Sen. Daniel Kagan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1093 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1093 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1093 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1093 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |