CO HB1092 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a pilot program for marijuana delivery, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Marijuana Delivery Pilot Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1092, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 18-1092 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 18-1092 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1092, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 18-1092 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 18-1092 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1092, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |