CO HB1089 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specific Wording Of Statewide Ballot Title
Title
Specific Wording Of Statewide Ballot Title
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Court [D] | Sen. Pat Steadman [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 12-1089 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 12-1089 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1089 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1089 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 12-1089 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1089 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1089 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-15 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-03-14 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2012-02-13 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-10 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |