CO HB1086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the operation of the Denver health and hospital authority.
Title
Operation of Denver Health & Hospital Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1086 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1086 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-02-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-01-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |