CO HB1085 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hearsay Exception For Developmentally Disabled
Title
Hearsay Exception For Developmentally Disabled
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-16 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |