CO HB1080 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Leg Emer Epidemic Response Cmt
Title
Leg Emer Epidemic Response Cmt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that House Bill 10-1080 be referred to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1080 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1080 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-10 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2010-02-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-29 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-01-26 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |