CO HB1079 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that the works allocation committee prepare annual recommendations for the use of the Colorado long-term works reserve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recommend Use Of State's Long-term Works Reserve

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1079 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1079 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01 Governor Signed
2018-02-22 Sent to the Governor
2018-02-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-02-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-02-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1079
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-01-29t133558z-hb18-1079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-01-29t133558z-hb18-1079-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1079vote5b0db5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-02-08t095700z-hb18-1079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1079vote59ba1f

Bill Comments 750

feedback