CO HB1076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of a hearing aid provider to perform services through the use of telehealth.
Title
Telehealth For Hearing Aid Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1076 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1076 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |