CO HB1076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning updates to the "Colorado Clean Indoor Air Act", and, in connection therewith, removing certain exceptions and adding provisions relevant to the use of electronic smoking devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Indoor Air Act Add E-cigarettes Remove Exceptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1076
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1076_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a01f165bae630e1872583ae0071b05b-hb19-1076-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1076vote571cce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/06020372ed206d11872583e7007cc9cf-hb19-1076-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1076vote670d44
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1076vote7023ae
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1076vote7036db

Bill Comments

feedback