CO HB1076 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the P.O.S.T. board revoking the certification of a peace officer who is found to have made an untruthful statement, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Peace Officers Standards and Training Board Revoke Certification For Untruthful Statement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 18-1076 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1076, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1076, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |