CO HB1075 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/08/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/08/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consideration of a statewide universal health-care payment system, and, in connection therewith, creating an analysis collaborative for the purpose of advising the Colorado school of public health in conducting an analysis of draft model legislation concerning a statewide universal health-care payment system and making an appropriation.
Title
Analysis of Universal Health-Care Payment System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1075 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1075 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.015) (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 16 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1075, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1075 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.015) (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 16 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1075, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/08/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |