CO HB1074 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning specifications for the offense of aggravated cruelty to a law enforcement animal.
Title
Aggravated Cruelty to Law Enforcement Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1074 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1074 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-02-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-30 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |