CO HB1073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electrical Industry Safety And Training Act
Title
Electrical Industry Safety And Training Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1073 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1073 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-01-26 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |