CO HB1073 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recording Of Deeds & Other Legal Documents
Title
Recording Of Deeds & Other Legal Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-01-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |