CO HB1072 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Ed Prior Learning Assessments
Title
Higher Ed Prior Learning Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1072, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1072, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1072 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1072, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1072, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2012-02-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-13 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |