CO HB1065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of measures that do not involve schedule I controlled substances to reduce the harm caused by substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harm Reduction Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment Q). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1065
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_en3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1065_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8c5806d9a188beda8725851300829a54-hb20-1065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8c5806d9a188beda8725851300829a54-hb20-1065-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8c5806d9a188beda8725851300829a54-hb20-1065-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6407d6d525a1b0798725858100535e61-hb20-1065-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6407d6d525a1b0798725858100535e61-hb20-1065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1065vote58027b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cdc1e1782c875218725858300604a52-hb20-1065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1065vote632b8d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cdc1e1782c875218725858300604a52-hb20-1065-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback