CO HB1061 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate Prison For Inability To Pay Fines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Prison For Inability To Pay Fines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment _) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-09HouseGovernor Signed
2014-04-28HouseSent to the Governor
2014-04-28HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-21SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-04-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F26528F6451383A287257C4A007189AA/$FILE/1061_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AC443A65F04D9A8D87257C8A0076D74B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6016C8FB3705D5F187257C8A00769CD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AC443A65F04D9A8D87257C8A0076D74B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6016C8FB3705D5F187257C8A00769CD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/56F33B1F16F4ACAC87257CB0004F91CB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8D974028F2CD231E87257CBC006F6EBA

Bill Comments 750

feedback